Welcome to our 2 Digit Multiplication Worksheets page.

We have plenty of worksheets on this page to help you practice the skills of multiplying 2-digit numbers
by 2 digits.

There are also step-by-step instructions and some worked examples to help you master this skill.

Quicklinks to ...

We have a range of resources on this page to help you learn to multiply 2-digit by 2-digit numbers.

There are pratice worksheets, worked examples and a video to help you learn this skill.

As well as standard multiplication worksheets, we have a range of extra challenges for students who are already confident with 2-digit multiplication.

These sheets are aimed at 4th grade (or similar level) students.

Before you learn to multiply two 2-digit numbers, you should be confident multiplying a 2-digit number by a single digit .

In this example, we are working out 39 x 25.

Step 1) Multiply the ones digit of the first 2-digit number (at the top) and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together.

- Write the number of ones below the line in the ones place.
- Carry over any tens and write them above the first 2-digit number in the tens place.

5 x 9 = 45. Write the 5 below the line in the ones place. Carry over 4 tens.

Step 2) Multiply the tens digit of the first 2-digit number and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together, adding on any tens that you carried over.

- Write the number below the line in the tens place (or in the hundreds and tens place if the answer has 2 digits).

5 x 3 = 15. 15 + 4 = 19. Write the 1 in the hundreds place and 9 in the tens place below the line.

We have now worked out: 39 x 5 = 195.

Step 3) We now have to work out 39 x 20. Put a 0 in the ones place underneath the 5. This is a placeholder because we are multiplying by tens. Cross out any numbers which were carried over so that we do not confuse them with the next steps.

Step 4) Multiply the ones digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together.

- Write the number below the line in the tens place carrying over any tens above the tens digit of the first number.

2 x 9 = 18. Write the 8 in the tens place to the left of the 0 we wrote in Step 3) and carry over 1 above the tens digit of the first number.

Step 5) Multiply the tens digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together, adding on any numbers that we carried over.

2 x 3 = 6. 6 + 1 = 7. Write the 7 in the hundreds place to the left of the 8 we wrote in Step 3).

We have now worked out: 39 x 20 = 780.

Step 6) Finally we have to add up the answers from the two multiplications we have just worked out.

We need to add up 195 and 780 (the answers from 39 x 5 and 39 x 20) to find 39 x 25.

Adding the two numbers using the standard method gives us:

Our final answer is 39 x 25 = 975.

Step 1) Multiply the ones digit of the first 2-digit number (at the top) and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together.

3 x 7 = 21. Write the 1 in the ones column underneath the line. Carry the 2 tens into the tens column above the number 3.

Step 2) Multiply the tens digit of the first 2-digit number and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together, adding on any tens that you carried over.

Write the answer below the tens digit.

3 x 3 = 9. 9 + 2 = 11. Write the 1 in the hundreds place and 1 in the tens place below the line.

This tells us that 37 x 3 = 111.

Step 3) We now have to work out 37 x 10. Put a 0 in the ones place underneath the 1. Cross out the '2' which we carried over so that we do not confuse it in the next steps.

Step 4) Multiply the ones digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together.

1 x 7 = 7. Write the 7 in the tens place to the left of the '0' we have just written.

Step 5) Multiply the tens digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together, adding on any numbers that we carried over.

1 x 3 = 3. Write the 3 in the hundreds place to the left of the '7' we have just written.

This tells us that 37 x 10 = 370.

Step 6) We now have to add up the two answers from the two multiplications we have just worked out.

We need to add up 111 and 370.

Adding the two numbers using the standard algorithm gives us:

This gives us a final answer of: 37 x 13 = 481

Step 1) Multiply the ones digit of the first 2-digit number (at the top) and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together.

5 x 6 = 30. Write the 0 in the ones column underneath the line. Carry the 3 tens into the tens column above the number 4.

Step 2) Multiply the tens digit of the first 2-digit number and the ones digit of the second 2-digit number together, adding on any tens that you carried over.

Write the answer below the tens digit.

5 x 4 = 20. 20 + 3 = 23. Write the 2 in the hundreds place and 3 in the tens place below the line.

This tells us that 46 x 5 = 230.

Step 3) We now have to work out 46 x 30. Put a 0 in the ones place underneath the 1 to use as a placeholder. Cross out the '3' which we carried over so that we do not confuse it in the next steps.

Step 4) Multiply the ones digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together.

3 x 6 = 18. Write the 8 in the tens place to the left of the '0' we have just written. Carry the 1 over and write it above the 3 we crossed out.

Step 5) Multiply the tens digit of the first number and the tens digit of the second number together, adding on any numbers that we carried over.

3 x 4 = 12. 12 + 1 = 13. Write the 1 in the thousands place and 3 in the hundreds place to the left of the '8' we have just written.

This tells us that 46 x 30 = 1380.

Step 6) We now have to add up the two answers from the two multiplications we have just worked out.

We need to add up 230 and 1380.

Adding the two numbers using the standard algorithm gives us:

This gives us a final answer of: 46 x 35 = 1610

8 x 9 = 72. Write the 2 in the ones column underneath the line. Carry the 7 tens into the tens column above the number 7.

Write the answer below the tens digit.

8 x 7 = 56. 56 + 7 = 63. Write the 6 in the hundreds place and 3 in the tens place below the line.

This tells us that 79 x 8 = 632.

Step 3) We now have to work out 79 x 20. Put a 0 in the ones place underneath the 2 to use as a placeholder. Cross out the '7' which we carried over so that we do not confuse it in the next steps.

2 x 9 = 18. Write the 8 in the tens place to the left of the '0' we have just written. Carry the 1 over and write it above the 7 we crossed out.

2 x 7 = 14. 14 + 1 = 15. Write the 1 in the thousands place and 5 in the hundreds place to the left of the '8' we have just written.

This tells us that 79 x 20 = 1580.

Step 6) We now have to add up the two answers from the two multiplications we have just worked out.

We need to add up 632 and 1580.

Adding the two numbers using the standard algorithm gives us:

This gives us a final answer of: 79 x 28 = 2212

These sheets are aimed at 4th graders.

Sheet 1 involves 2-digit by 2-digit multiplication with smaller numbers and answers up to 1000.

Sheets 2 to 4 have harder 2-digit numbers to multiply and answers that are generally larger than 1000.

These 2-digit multiplication worksheets have been designed for more able students who need that extra challenge!

These sheets are aimed at 3rd graders.

We have a range of 2-digit by 1-digit multiplication worksheets and challenges available on our 3rd grade multiplication page.

There are also some worked examples and support to help you master this skill.

We have more 2-digit multiplication worksheets, including 2-digit x 3-digit multiplication problems on this page.

Take a look at some more of our worksheets similar to these.

Need to create your own long or short multiplication worksheets quickly and easily?

Our Multiplication worksheet generator will allow you to create your own custom worksheets to print out, complete with answers.

Here you will find a range of Multiplication Worksheets to help you become more fluent and accurate with your tables.

Using these sheets will help your child to:

- learn their multiplication tables up to 10 x 10;
- understand and use different models of multiplication;
- solve a range of Multiplication problems.

All the free 3rd Grade Math Worksheets in this section are informed by the Elementary Math Benchmarks for 3rd Grade.

Here you will find a range of Free Printable Multiplication Games to help kids learn their multiplication facts.

Using these games will help your child to learn their multiplication facts to 5x5 or 10x10, and also to develop their memory and strategic thinking skills.

How to Print or Save these sheets

Need help with printing or saving?

Follow these 3 easy steps to get your worksheets printed out perfectly!

How to Print or Save these sheets

Need help with printing or saving?

Follow these 3 easy steps to get your worksheets printed out perfectly!

Return to 3rd Grade Math Worksheets

Return to Multiplication Worksheets

Return from 2 Digit Multiplication Worksheets to Math Salamanders Homepage

The Math Salamanders hope you enjoy using these free printable Math worksheets and all our other Math games and resources.

We welcome any comments about our site or worksheets on the Facebook comments box at the bottom of every page.

Looking for some fun printable math games?

We have some great games for you to play in our Math Games e-books!

Do you know how old you are...in weeks? days? hours?

Are you more than a million minutes old?

Find out how old you are to the nearest second!

We have updated and improved our fraction calculators to show you how to solve your fraction problems step-by-step!

Take a look and try them out!

Have a look at some of our most popular pages to see different Math activities and ideas you could use with your child

- Reverse Percentage Calculator
- List of Geometric Shapes
- Equivalent Fractions
- 3d Geometric Shapes
- Perimeter Worksheets

If you are a regular user of our site and appreciate what we do, please consider making a small donation to help us with our costs.

Get a free sample copy of our Math Salamanders Dice Games book with each donation!

Looking for a fun and motivating way to learn and practice math skills?

Why not try one of our free printable math games with your students!

## New! Comments

Have your say about the Math resources on this page! Leave me a comment in the box below.